U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-mj-00056-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ferguson
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 06, 2021: [Order on Stipulation]
  • May 06, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings]
  • May 06, 2021: [Order]
January, 2021
  • January 22, 2021: [Order]
  • January 22, 2021: [Order on Stipulation]
  • January 22, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings]
October, 2020
  • October 16, 2020: [Order on Stipulation]
  • October 16, 2020: [Order]
  • October 16, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings]
August, 2020
  • August 24, 2020: [Order on Stipulation]
  • August 24, 2020: [Order]
  • August 24, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings]
  • August 03, 2020: [Order on Stipulation]
  • August 03, 2020: [Order]
  • August 03, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings]
May, 2020
  • May 07, 2020: [Order on Stipulation]
  • May 07, 2020: [Order]
  • May 07, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings]
March, 2020
  • March 11, 2020: [Order on Stipulation]
  • March 11, 2020: [Order]
  • March 11, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings]
February, 2020
  • February 21, 2020: [Order]
  • February 21, 2020: [Order on Stipulation]
  • February 21, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings]
  • February 12, 2020: [Detention Order]
  • February 11, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel FPD]
  • February 03, 2020: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.