U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-mj-00114-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Riveros-Gomez
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2020
  • May 14, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines/Hearings]
April, 2020
  • April 10, 2020: [Order on Stipulation]
  • April 10, 2020: [Order]
  • April 01, 2020: [Order on Stipulation]
  • April 01, 2020: [Order]
  • April 01, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings]
March, 2020
  • March 23, 2020: [Order on Stipulation]
  • March 23, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings]
  • March 23, 2020: [Order]
February, 2020
  • February 21, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings]
  • February 21, 2020: [Order on Stipulation]
  • February 21, 2020: [Order]
  • February 14, 2020: [Detention Order]
  • February 14, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel FPD]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.