open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nevada

NEVADA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nevada
    Case Number:3:20-cr-00003-3
    Party Name:USA v. Meza-Campos et al
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:March 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
    Date Published:March 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
    Date Published:March 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines (non motion ddls)]
    Date Published:March 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
    Date Published:March 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention Order]
    Date Published:February 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Regarding Pretrial Procedure]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Appointing Counsel CJA]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Appointing Counsel FPD]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.nvd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?141236
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 3 =