U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-mj-00123-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Smith
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2020
  • October 09, 2020: [Order on Stipulation]
  • October 09, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 09, 2020: [Order]
September, 2020
  • September 14, 2020: [Order on Stipulation]
  • September 14, 2020: [Order]
  • September 14, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings]
July, 2020
  • July 02, 2020: [Order on Stipulation]
  • July 02, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 02, 2020: [Order]
June, 2020
  • June 03, 2020: [Order on Stipulation]
  • June 03, 2020: [Order]
  • June 03, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2020
  • March 26, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 25, 2020: [Order on Stipulation]
  • March 25, 2020: [Order]
  • March 25, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 06, 2020: [Order on Stipulation]
  • March 06, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 06, 2020: [Order]
February, 2020
  • February 26, 2020: [Detention Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.