U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-mj-00208-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Davis
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 02, 2020: [Judgment]
September, 2020
  • September 04, 2020: [Order on Petition for Warrant]
July, 2020
  • July 01, 2020: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
May, 2020
  • May 13, 2020: [Order on Stipulation]
  • May 13, 2020: [Order]
  • May 13, 2020: [~Util - Excludable XT start & stop for Ends of Justice]
  • May 13, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2020
  • March 13, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel FPD]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.