U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-mj-00274-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Marcelino
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 06, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 06, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Defendant/Case/Counts]
May, 2021
  • May 11, 2021: [Order on Stipulation]
  • May 11, 2021: [Order]
  • May 11, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
April, 2021
  • April 08, 2021: [Order on Stipulation]
  • April 08, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 08, 2021: [Order]
February, 2021
  • February 03, 2021: [Order on Stipulation]
  • February 03, 2021: [Order]
  • February 03, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
December, 2020
  • December 02, 2020: [Order on Stipulation]
  • December 02, 2020: [Order]
  • December 02, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2020
  • September 24, 2020: [Order]
  • September 24, 2020: [Order on Stipulation]
  • September 24, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
July, 2020
  • July 29, 2020: [Order on Stipulation]
  • July 29, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings]
  • July 29, 2020: [Order]
  • July 14, 2020: [Order]
  • July 14, 2020: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
June, 2020
  • June 30, 2020: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • June 22, 2020: [Order]
  • June 22, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
April, 2020
  • April 29, 2020: [Order on Stipulation]
  • April 29, 2020: [Order]
  • April 29, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings]
  • April 17, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel FPD]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.