U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-mj-00302-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Figgers
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 05, 2021: [Order]
  • August 05, 2021: [Order on Stipulation]
  • August 05, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2021
  • June 04, 2021: [Order on Stipulation]
  • June 04, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings]
April, 2021
  • April 28, 2021: [Order on Stipulation]
  • April 28, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 28, 2021: [Order]
February, 2021
  • February 25, 2021: [Order on Stipulation]
  • February 25, 2021: [Order]
  • February 25, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
December, 2020
  • December 23, 2020: [Order on Stipulation]
  • December 23, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings]
  • December 23, 2020: [Order]
October, 2020
  • October 23, 2020: [Order on Stipulation]
  • October 23, 2020: [Order]
  • October 23, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2020
  • August 19, 2020: [Order]
  • August 19, 2020: [Order on Stipulation]
  • August 19, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2020
  • June 18, 2020: [Order]
  • June 18, 2020: [Order on Stipulation]
  • June 18, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2020
  • May 13, 2020: [Order on Stipulation]
  • May 13, 2020: [Order]
  • May 13, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 04, 2020: [Detention Order]
  • May 01, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel FPD]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.