U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-mj-00310-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Weaver
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2020
  • September 25, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings]
  • September 02, 2020: [Order on Stipulation]
  • September 02, 2020: [Order]
  • September 02, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
July, 2020
  • July 30, 2020: [Order]
  • July 30, 2020: [Order on Stipulation]
  • July 30, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2020
  • June 12, 2020: [Order on Stipulation]
  • June 12, 2020: [Order]
  • June 12, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2020
  • May 13, 2020: [Order on Stipulation]
  • May 13, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 13, 2020: [Order]
  • May 04, 2020: [Detention Order]
  • May 01, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel FPD]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.