U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-mj-00464-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Walker et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
June, 2020
  • June 10, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 09, 2020: [Order]
  • June 09, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel FPD]
  • June 09, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel CJA]
  • June 09, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 08, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 07, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 05, 2020: [Order on Motion for Review of Magistrate Judge Release or Detention Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.