U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-mj-00571-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Mundo-Ramirez
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2020
  • October 20, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Defendant/Case/Counts]
  • October 20, 2020: [Order on Stipulation]
  • October 20, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings]
  • October 20, 2020: [Order]
August, 2020
  • August 11, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel CJA]
July, 2020
  • July 29, 2020: [Order]
  • July 29, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings]
  • July 27, 2020: [Order on Stipulation]
  • July 27, 2020: [Order]
  • July 27, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings]
  • July 22, 2020: [Detention Order]
  • July 21, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel CJA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.