U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-mj-00612-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Allison
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 04, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines/Hearings]
December, 2020
  • December 08, 2020: [Order]
  • December 08, 2020: [Order on Stipulation]
  • December 08, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
November, 2020
  • November 05, 2020: [Order on Stipulation]
  • November 05, 2020: [Order]
  • November 05, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2020
  • October 09, 2020: [Order on Stipulation]
  • October 09, 2020: [Order]
  • October 09, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2020
  • September 03, 2020: [Order]
  • September 03, 2020: [Order on Stipulation]
  • September 03, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2020
  • August 03, 2020: [Detention Order]
July, 2020
  • July 29, 2020: [Order on Stipulation]
  • July 29, 2020: [Order]
  • July 29, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.