U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-mj-00548-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Zavala-Rodriguez
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2020
  • September 23, 2020: [Order on Stipulation]
  • September 23, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 23, 2020: [Order]
  • September 02, 2020: [Order on Stipulation]
August, 2020
  • August 18, 2020: [Order on Stipulation]
  • August 18, 2020: [Order]
  • August 18, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 13, 2020: [Detention Order]
  • August 11, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel FPD]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.