U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-mj-00698-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Johnson
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 03, 2022: [Order on Stipulation]
  • May 03, 2022: [Order]
  • May 03, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
February, 2022
  • February 17, 2022: [Order on Stipulation]
  • February 17, 2022: [Order]
  • February 17, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
November, 2021
  • November 05, 2021: [Order on Stipulation]
  • November 05, 2021: [Order]
  • November 05, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel FPD]
September, 2020
  • September 04, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines/Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.