U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-mj-00633-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gasior
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 04, 2022: [Order on Stipulation]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Order on Stipulation]
  • November 29, 2021: [Order]
  • November 29, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2021
  • August 16, 2021: [Order]
  • August 16, 2021: [Order on Stipulation]
  • August 16, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2021
  • May 04, 2021: [Order]
  • May 04, 2021: [Order on Stipulation]
  • May 04, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings]
  • May 04, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines (non motion ddls)]
January, 2021
  • January 15, 2021: [Order on Stipulation]
  • January 15, 2021: [Order]
  • January 15, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2020
  • September 16, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.