U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-mj-00358-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lomeli-Lopez
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 07, 2021: [Order on Stipulation]
  • December 07, 2021: [Order]
  • December 07, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2021
  • October 20, 2021: [Order on Stipulation]
  • October 20, 2021: [Order]
  • October 20, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2021
  • March 25, 2021: [Order on Stipulation]
  • March 25, 2021: [Order]
  • March 25, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
December, 2020
  • December 08, 2020: [Order on Stipulation]
  • December 08, 2020: [Order]
  • December 08, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 01, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines/Hearings]
November, 2020
  • November 05, 2020: [Order on Stipulation]
  • November 05, 2020: [Order]
  • November 05, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: [Order on Motion to Quash]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.