U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-mj-00519-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cates
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 02, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines/Hearings]
May, 2021
  • May 21, 2021: [Order on Stipulation]
  • May 21, 2021: [Order]
  • May 21, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2021
  • March 11, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 11, 2021: [Order]
February, 2021
  • February 18, 2021: [Order]
  • February 18, 2021: [Order on Stipulation]
  • February 18, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
January, 2021
  • January 15, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel CJA]
  • January 13, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 13, 2021: [Order]
  • January 13, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
November, 2020
  • November 19, 2020: [Detention Order]
  • November 16, 2020: [Order]
  • November 16, 2020: [Order on Stipulation]
  • November 16, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings]
  • November 12, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel FPD]
October, 2020
  • October 19, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.