U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-mj-01078-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Torres
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
February, 2021
  • February 18, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 17, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 17, 2021: [Order]
  • February 17, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 05, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2020
  • December 23, 2020: [Order on Stipulation]
  • December 23, 2020: [Order]
  • December 23, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 23, 2020: [Detention Order]
  • December 16, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel FPD]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.