U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-mj-01098-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ray
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 07, 2021: [Order on Stipulation]
  • September 07, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings]
  • September 07, 2021: [Order]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Order]
  • July 30, 2021: [Order on Stipulation]
  • July 30, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
June, 2021
  • June 25, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel CJA]
  • June 25, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
May, 2021
  • May 06, 2021: [Order on Stipulation]
  • May 06, 2021: [Order]
  • May 06, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2021
  • March 03, 2021: [Order on Stipulation]
  • March 03, 2021: [Order]
  • March 03, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
January, 2021
  • January 25, 2021: [Order]
  • January 25, 2021: [Order on Stipulation]
  • January 25, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 05, 2021: [Order]
  • January 05, 2021: [Order on Stipulation]
  • January 05, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 04, 2021: [Detention Order]
December, 2020
  • December 29, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel FPD]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.