U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-mj-00139-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cherry
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 02, 2021: [Order on Stipulation]
  • August 02, 2021: [Order]
  • August 02, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2021
  • June 22, 2021: [Order]
  • June 22, 2021: [Order on Stipulation]
  • June 22, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 17, 2021: [Order on Stipulation]
April, 2021
  • April 21, 2021: [Order on Stipulation]
  • April 21, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 21, 2021: [Order]
March, 2021
  • March 02, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel CJA]
February, 2021
  • February 24, 2021: [Order]
  • February 24, 2021: [Order on Stipulation]
  • February 24, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 12, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel CJA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.