U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-mj-00862-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rincon
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Order on Stipulation]
  • July 25, 2022: [Order]
  • July 25, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [Order on Stipulation]
  • June 22, 2022: [Order]
  • June 22, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2022
  • May 11, 2022: [Order on Stipulation]
  • May 11, 2022: [Order]
  • May 11, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
January, 2022
  • January 24, 2022: [Order on Stipulation]
  • January 24, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
December, 2021
  • December 16, 2021: [Order]
  • December 16, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2021
  • October 18, 2021: [Order on Stipulation]
  • October 18, 2021: [Order]
  • October 18, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2021
  • September 17, 2021: [Order]
  • September 17, 2021: [Order on Stipulation]
  • September 17, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
July, 2021
  • July 02, 2021: [Order on Stipulation]
  • July 02, 2021: [~Util - Excludable XT start & stop for Ends of Justice]
  • July 02, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2021
  • June 17, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines/Hearings]
April, 2021
  • April 28, 2021: [Order]
  • April 28, 2021: [Order on Stipulation]
  • April 28, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings]
February, 2021
  • February 17, 2021: [Order on Stipulation]
  • February 17, 2021: [Order]
  • February 17, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.