U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-mj-00150-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Powell
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 08, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines/Hearings]
August, 2021
  • August 12, 2021: [Order on Stipulation]
  • August 12, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 12, 2021: [Order]
June, 2021
  • June 21, 2021: [Order]
  • June 21, 2021: [Order on Stipulation]
  • June 21, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
April, 2021
  • April 26, 2021: [Order]
  • April 26, 2021: [Order on Stipulation]
  • April 26, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
February, 2021
  • February 23, 2021: [Order on Stipulation]
  • February 23, 2021: [Order]
  • February 23, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 18, 2021: [Detention Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.