U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-mj-00984-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Nusbaum
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 13, 2022: [Detention Order]
  • October 07, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation of Prob/SR]
  • October 05, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel FPD]
November, 2021
  • November 12, 2021: [Judgment]
June, 2021
  • June 08, 2021: [Order on Stipulation]
  • June 08, 2021: [Order]
  • June 08, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 08, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2021
  • May 04, 2021: [Order on Stipulation]
  • May 04, 2021: [Order]
  • May 04, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
February, 2021
  • February 23, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.