U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-mj-00231-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Mattingly
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 13, 2021: [Order on Stipulation]
  • July 13, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 13, 2021: [Order]
June, 2021
  • June 07, 2021: [Order]
  • June 07, 2021: [Order on Stipulation]
  • June 07, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings]
May, 2021
  • May 03, 2021: [Order on Stipulation]
  • May 03, 2021: [Order]
  • May 03, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings]
March, 2021
  • March 30, 2021: [Order on Stipulation]
  • March 30, 2021: [Order]
  • March 30, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings]
  • March 22, 2021: [Detention Order]
  • March 19, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel FPD]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.