U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-mj-00553-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Muhina
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 03, 2022: [Order on Stipulation]
  • November 03, 2022: [Order]
  • November 03, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Order on Stipulation]
  • August 30, 2022: [Order]
  • August 30, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
July, 2022
  • July 11, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel CJA]
  • July 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 01, 2022: [Order]
  • July 01, 2022: [Order on Stipulation]
  • July 01, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel CJA]
  • May 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 24, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • May 13, 2022: [Order on Stipulation]
  • May 13, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 13, 2022: [Order]
March, 2022
  • March 14, 2022: [Order]
  • March 14, 2022: [Order on Stipulation]
  • March 14, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
January, 2022
  • January 26, 2022: [Order]
  • January 26, 2022: [Order on Stipulation]
  • January 26, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
December, 2021
  • December 15, 2021: [Order]
  • December 15, 2021: [Order on Stipulation]
  • December 15, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2021
  • October 22, 2021: [Order on Stipulation]
  • October 22, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 22, 2021: [Order]
September, 2021
  • September 08, 2021: [Order on Stipulation]
  • September 08, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 08, 2021: [Order]
July, 2021
  • July 22, 2021: [Detention Order]
  • July 15, 2021: [Order on Stipulation]
  • July 15, 2021: [Order]
  • July 15, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 13, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel FPD]
  • July 12, 2021: [Order]
  • July 12, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings]
June, 2021
  • June 25, 2021: [Order on Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum / ad Testificandum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.