U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-mj-00333-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Mims
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Order on Stipulation]
  • November 28, 2022: [Order]
  • November 28, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Order on Stipulation]
  • August 25, 2022: [Order]
  • August 25, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2022
  • June 08, 2022: [Order on Stipulation]
  • June 08, 2022: [Order]
  • June 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
April, 2022
  • April 01, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 01, 2022: [Order on Stipulation]
  • April 01, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 01, 2022: [Order]
January, 2022
  • January 24, 2022: [Order]
  • January 24, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
November, 2021
  • November 15, 2021: [Order on Stipulation]
  • November 15, 2021: [Order]
  • November 15, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2021
  • October 18, 2021: [Order on Stipulation]
  • October 18, 2021: [Order]
  • October 18, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2021
  • September 20, 2021: [Order on Stipulation]
  • September 20, 2021: [Order]
  • September 20, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2021
  • August 23, 2021: [Order on Stipulation]
  • August 23, 2021: [Order]
  • August 23, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 12, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel FPD]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.