U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-mj-00822-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ocampo-Solis
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 09, 2022: [Order on Stipulation]
  • March 09, 2022: [Order]
  • March 09, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
January, 2022
  • January 10, 2022: [Order on Stipulation]
  • January 10, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 10, 2022: [Order]
October, 2021
  • October 13, 2021: [Detention Order]
  • October 12, 2021: [Order on Stipulation]
  • October 08, 2021: [Order on Stipulation]
  • October 08, 2021: [Order]
  • October 08, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings]
  • October 07, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel FPD]
  • October 07, 2021: [BICE Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.