U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00161-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Housley et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 02, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 02, 2023: [Order]
  • January 02, 2023: [~Util - Excludable XT start & stop for Ends of Justice]
  • January 02, 2023: [Order on Stipulation]
December, 2022
  • December 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Order on Stipulation]
  • October 24, 2022: [Order]
  • October 24, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings]
September, 2022
  • September 12, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
August, 2022
  • August 18, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines/Hearings]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Order Regarding Pretrial Procedure]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.