U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cr-00051-1
  • Case Name: USA v. SMITH
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Response to Motion]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Motion Compel]
  • April 28, 2025: [Supplement]
  • April 23, 2025: [Exhibit List]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • April 23, 2025: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend/Shorten Time]
  • April 17, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 16, 2025: [Supplement]
  • April 11, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 09, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • April 09, 2025: [Motion Suppress]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order]
  • April 07, 2025: [Response - Other]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice - Other]
  • March 25, 2025: [Motion Dismiss]
  • March 24, 2025: [Brief]
  • March 24, 2025: [Opening Brief]
November, 2022
  • November 03, 2022: [Order]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • October 28, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines (non motion ddls)]
  • October 28, 2022: [~Util - Excludable XT start & stop for Ends of Justice]
  • October 28, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 28, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings]
  • October 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
September, 2022
  • September 12, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings]
  • September 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2022
  • August 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • August 04, 2022: [Order]
  • August 04, 2022: [Order of Recusal]
  • August 01, 2022: [Order Regarding Pretrial Procedure]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.