U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00169-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hajj-Hussein
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 17, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 17, 2025: [Stipulation]
January, 2023
  • January 13, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
September, 2022
  • September 09, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
August, 2022
  • August 19, 2022: [Order Regarding Pretrial Procedure]
  • August 04, 2022: [Order]
  • August 04, 2022: [Order on Stipulation]
  • August 04, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.