U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cr-00053-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Scherer
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Order on Stipulation]
  • December 28, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings]
  • December 28, 2022: [~Util - Excludable XT start & stop for Ends of Justice]
September, 2022
  • September 20, 2022: [Order on Stipulation]
  • September 20, 2022: [~Util - Excludable XT start & stop for Ends of Justice]
  • September 20, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings]
  • September 13, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings]
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: [Detention Order]
  • August 24, 2022: [Order Regarding Pretrial Procedure]
  • August 24, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel CJA]
  • August 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.