U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00175-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Abrahamian
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: [Judgment]
  • April 16, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • April 11, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • April 10, 2025: [Minute Order]
  • April 09, 2025: [Motion Seal]
  • April 09, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [Minute Order Setting Hearing]
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 21, 2022: [Order]
  • December 21, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines/Hearings]
September, 2022
  • September 20, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 12, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines/Hearings]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • August 19, 2022: [Order Regarding Pretrial Procedure]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.