U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cr-00135-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Urena
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Judgment on Revocation of Prob/SR]
  • April 23, 2025: [Revocation of Supervised Release]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Addendum to Petition]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Stipulation]
  • April 02, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 01, 2025: [Stipulation]
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: [12D Hearing re Conditions of Supervision]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.