U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cr-00116-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Puebla
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 22, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • April 18, 2025: [Motion Seal]
  • April 18, 2025: [Motion Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2025
  • March 19, 2025: [Order]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Stipulation]
  • March 19, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 19, 2025: [Stipulation]
  • March 14, 2025: [Presentence Report (with padlock)]
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: [Minute Order Setting Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.