U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cr-00103-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Medina-Juarez, et al.
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: [Judgment]
  • April 16, 2025: [Preliminary Order of Forfeiture]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Stipulation]
  • April 16, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order]
  • April 16, 2025: [Plea Agreement/Memorandum]
  • April 16, 2025: [Plea and Sentencing]
  • April 16, 2025: [Docket Entry - Generic]
  • April 15, 2025: [Minute Order]
  • April 15, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 15, 2025: [Stipulation]
  • April 10, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • April 04, 2025: [Presentence Report (with padlock)]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Preliminary Order of Forfeiture]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order]
  • March 25, 2025: [Plea Agreement/Memorandum]
  • March 25, 2025: [Change of Plea]
October, 2024
  • October 08, 2024: [Grand Jury Returns]
  • October 08, 2024: [Superseding Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.