U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cr-00064-7
  • Case Name: USA v. Funches et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order Appointing Counsel CJA]
  • April 28, 2025: [Minute Order]
  • April 28, 2025: [Stipulation]
  • April 25, 2025: [Non-Opposition]
  • April 25, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • April 22, 2025: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order]
  • April 22, 2025: [Motion Appointment of Counsel]
  • April 21, 2025: [Motion Continue Hearing]
  • April 18, 2025: [Motion Appointment of Counsel]
  • April 14, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 14, 2025: [Minute Order]
  • April 11, 2025: [Status Report]
  • April 11, 2025: [Motion Joinder]
  • April 11, 2025: [Motion Suppress]
  • April 11, 2025: [Detention Order]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order Appointing Counsel CJA]
  • April 09, 2025: [Minute Order Due Process Protections Act]
  • April 09, 2025: [Initial/ Arraignment & Plea]
  • April 09, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 09, 2025: [Minute Order Setting Hearing]
  • April 08, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 04, 2025: [Motion Joinder]
  • April 04, 2025: [Motion In Limine]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion for Joinder]
  • March 31, 2025: [Minute Order]
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 27, 2025: [Minute Order Setting Hearing]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 27, 2025: [Minute Order]
  • March 25, 2025: [Transcript]
  • March 25, 2025: [Exhibit]
  • March 21, 2025: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • March 21, 2025: [Plea Agreement/Memorandum]
  • March 20, 2025: [RISE Court]
  • March 20, 2025: [Change of Plea]
  • March 18, 2025: [Minute Order]
  • March 18, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
February, 2025
  • February 23, 2025: [Motion Appointment of Counsel]
January, 2025
  • January 17, 2025: [Minute Order]
October, 2024
  • October 08, 2024: [Reply to Response to Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.