U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cr-00055-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lopez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Errata]
  • April 28, 2025: [Motion Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 28, 2025: [Motion New Trial]
  • April 23, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 18, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 15, 2025: [Jury Verdict]
  • April 15, 2025: [Jury Instructions]
  • April 15, 2025: [Exhibit List]
  • April 15, 2025: [Jury Trial]
  • April 14, 2025: [Transcript]
  • April 14, 2025: [Motion Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 14, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Stipulation]
  • April 14, 2025: [~Util - Excludable XT start & stop for Ends of Justice]
  • April 11, 2025: [Stipulation]
  • April 11, 2025: [XX - Order on Motion for Reconsideration TURNED OFF]
  • April 11, 2025: [Jury Trial]
  • April 10, 2025: [Transcript]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion to Sever Defendant]
  • April 10, 2025: [Jury Trial]
  • April 09, 2025: [Exhibit]
  • April 09, 2025: [Motion Reconsider]
  • April 08, 2025: [Transcript]
  • April 08, 2025: [Jury Trial]
  • April 08, 2025: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • April 08, 2025: [Exhibit List]
  • April 07, 2025: [Transcript]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 07, 2025: [Jury Trial]
  • April 07, 2025: [Motion Sever Defendant or Counts]
  • April 06, 2025: [Reply - Other]
  • April 06, 2025: [Notice - Other]
  • April 05, 2025: [Status Report]
  • April 04, 2025: [Transcript]
  • April 04, 2025: [Objection to Notice]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order]
  • April 03, 2025: [Transcript]
  • April 03, 2025: [Jury Trial]
  • April 02, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 02, 2025: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 02, 2025: [Transcript]
  • April 02, 2025: [Jury Trial]
  • April 01, 2025: [Transcript]
  • April 01, 2025: [Motion Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Response - Other]
  • March 31, 2025: [Transcript]
  • March 31, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • March 31, 2025: [Jury Trial]
  • March 29, 2025: [Transcript]
  • March 28, 2025: [Transcript]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • March 28, 2025: [Jury Trial]
  • March 28, 2025: [Detention Order]
  • March 27, 2025: [Motion Seal]
  • March 27, 2025: [Motion Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 27, 2025: [Transcript]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order Regarding Pretrial Procedure]
  • March 27, 2025: [Jury Trial]
  • March 26, 2025: [Minute Order Setting Hearing]
  • March 26, 2025: [Waiver of Interstate Agreement on Detainers Act]
  • March 26, 2025: [Assertion of Right to Counsel]
  • March 26, 2025: [Assertion of Right to be Unshackled]
  • March 26, 2025: [Jury Trial - Voir Dire/Jury Selection]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order Appointing Counsel FPD]
  • March 26, 2025: [Transcript]
  • March 25, 2025: [Transcript]
  • March 25, 2025: [Minute Order Due Process Protections Act]
  • March 25, 2025: [Initial/ Arraignment & Plea]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • March 25, 2025: [Jury Trial - Voir Dire/Jury Selection]
  • March 25, 2025: [XX - Order on Motion for Reconsideration TURNED OFF]
  • March 24, 2025: [Transcript]
  • March 24, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • March 21, 2025: [Motion Reconsider]
  • March 21, 2025: [Witness List]
  • March 21, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • March 21, 2025: [Calendar Call]
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice - Other]
  • March 20, 2025: [Supplement]
  • March 19, 2025: [Notice - Other]
  • March 19, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order]
  • March 18, 2025: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • March 18, 2025: [Proposed Verdict Form]
  • March 18, 2025: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • March 18, 2025: [Trial Brief]
  • March 17, 2025: [Status Report]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order]
  • March 13, 2025: [Transcript]
  • March 12, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • March 12, 2025: [Motion Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 12, 2025: [Grand Jury Return]
  • March 12, 2025: [Indictment]
  • March 12, 2025: [Assign Judges in Criminal Case]
  • March 10, 2025: [Exhibit List]
  • March 10, 2025: [Witness List]
  • March 10, 2025: [Minute Order]
  • March 10, 2025: [Order on Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 09, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
October, 2024
  • October 30, 2024: [Motion Compel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.