U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:23-cr-00009-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Craig et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 30, 2025: [Presentence Report (with padlock)]
  • April 04, 2025: [Presentence Report (with padlock)]
March, 2025
  • March 14, 2025: [Minute Order]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice Contact Probation]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Stipulation]
  • March 13, 2025: [Notice of Corrected Image/Document]
  • March 13, 2025: [Stipulation]
February, 2025
  • February 03, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.