U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cr-00019-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Martinez-Olmos
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Notice Contact Probation]
  • March 26, 2025: [Change of Plea]
  • March 21, 2025: [Memorandum]
  • March 17, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 14, 2025: [Minute Order Setting Hearing]
  • March 11, 2025: [Minute Order]
  • March 11, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines (non motion ddls)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.