U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cr-00189-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Fain et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Motion Acquittal]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Stipulation]
  • April 22, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings]
  • April 21, 2025: [Stipulation]
  • April 21, 2025: [Transcript]
  • April 18, 2025: [Transcript]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order Re Jury Meals]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 09, 2025: [Jury Verdict]
  • April 09, 2025: [Exhibit List]
  • April 09, 2025: [Jury Instructions]
  • April 09, 2025: [Jury Trial]
  • April 08, 2025: [Jury Trial]
  • April 07, 2025: [Exhibit List]
  • April 07, 2025: [Pretrial Conference]
  • April 07, 2025: [QC Notice]
  • April 07, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 04, 2025: [Motion In Limine]
  • April 04, 2025: [Exhibit List]
  • April 04, 2025: [Witness List]
  • April 04, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 04, 2025: [Motion Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 03, 2025: [Motion In Limine]
  • April 03, 2025: [Transcript]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • April 01, 2025: [Daubert Hearing]
  • April 01, 2025: [Response to Motion]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • March 31, 2025: [Motion In Limine]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • March 26, 2025: [Calendar Call]
  • March 25, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • March 24, 2025: [Motion Seal]
  • March 24, 2025: [Witness List]
  • March 24, 2025: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • March 24, 2025: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • March 24, 2025: [Exhibit List]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order on Motion for Joinder]
  • March 20, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • March 19, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 19, 2025: [Minute Order]
  • March 18, 2025: [Motion In Limine]
  • March 18, 2025: [Motion Joinder]
  • March 14, 2025: [Motion Strike]
  • March 12, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order Regarding Trial]
  • March 10, 2025: [Notice - Other]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.