U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cr-00114-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Williams
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 01, 2025: [Order Appointing Counsel CJA]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 28, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 27, 2025: [Stipulation]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order]
  • March 27, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 11, 2025: [Motion Miscellaneous Relief]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.