U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cr-00057-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Mitjans
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 14, 2025: [Stipulation]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Minute Order]
  • March 28, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings]
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 17, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 17, 2025: [Assertion of Right to Counsel]
  • March 17, 2025: [Assertion of Right to be Unshackled]
  • March 17, 2025: [Bond]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order Regarding Pretrial Procedure]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order Appointing Counsel FPD]
  • March 14, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 13, 2025: [Minute Order Due Process Protections Act]
  • March 13, 2025: [Initial/ Arraignment & Plea]
  • March 12, 2025: [Grand Jury Return]
  • March 12, 2025: [Indictment]
  • March 12, 2025: [Assign Judges in Criminal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.