U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cr-00056-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Burrell
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Motion In Limine]
  • April 22, 2025: [Non-Opposition]
  • April 21, 2025: [Motion Psychiatric Evaluation]
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice - Other]
  • April 18, 2025: [Notice - Other]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order Regarding Trial]
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 14, 2025: [Status Report]
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 03, 2025: [Notice - Other]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Minute Order]
  • March 28, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings]
  • March 21, 2025: [Joint Discovery Agreement]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order Regarding Pretrial Procedure]
  • March 21, 2025: [Arraignment/Plea]
  • March 12, 2025: [Grand Jury Return]
  • March 12, 2025: [Indictment]
  • March 12, 2025: [Assign Judges in Criminal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.