U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cr-00054-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Iniguez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Detention Order]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order Regarding Pretrial Procedure]
  • March 26, 2025: [Designation of Retained Counsel]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Stipulation]
  • March 25, 2025: [Minute Order Due Process Protections Act]
  • March 25, 2025: [Initial/ Arraignment & Plea]
  • March 24, 2025: [Stipulation]
  • March 19, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 12, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • March 12, 2025: [Motion Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 12, 2025: [Grand Jury Return]
  • March 12, 2025: [Indictment]
  • March 12, 2025: [Assign Judges in Criminal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.