U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:23-cr-00020-3
  • Case Name: USA v. Garcia et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Miscellaneous Hearing]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order]
  • April 22, 2025: [Judgment]
  • April 22, 2025: [Motion Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 11, 2025: [Minute Order Setting Hearing]
  • April 10, 2025: [Judgment]
  • April 09, 2025: [Judgment]
  • April 08, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • April 07, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice - Other]
  • April 02, 2025: [Notice - Other]
  • April 02, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • April 01, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Stipulation]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Stipulation]
  • March 27, 2025: [Presentence Report (with padlock)]
  • March 26, 2025: [Notice - Other]
  • March 26, 2025: [Presentence Report (with padlock)]
  • March 13, 2025: [Presentence Report (with padlock)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.