U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:10-cr-00121-3
  • Case Name: USA v. Depue et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice - Other]
  • April 01, 2025: [Motion Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2025
  • March 18, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 14, 2025: [Writ of Garnishment]
  • March 13, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.