U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cr-00206-7
  • Case Name: USA v. Marquez-Garcia et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 18, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • April 14, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 14, 2025: [Minute Order]
  • April 11, 2025: [Motion Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 07, 2025: [Stipulation]
March, 2025
  • March 18, 2025: [Presentence Report (with padlock)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.