U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cv-01202
  • Case Name: Doe v. Boys and Girls Clubs of Southern Nevada et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • May 01, 2025: [Minute Order]
  • May 01, 2025: [Notice Other]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Response]
  • April 16, 2025: [Motion Amend/Correct]
  • April 07, 2025: [Non-Opposition to Motion]
  • April 04, 2025: [Stipulation]
  • April 04, 2025: [Motion Miscellaneous Relief]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.