U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00019
  • Case Name: Corral v. National Consumer Telecom & Utilities Exchange, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: [Certificate Interested Parties]
  • May 14, 2025: [Motion Extend/Shorten Time]
  • May 05, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend/Shorten Time]
  • May 05, 2025: [Order]
  • May 01, 2025: [Notice Other]
  • May 01, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 22, 2025: [Motion Extend/Shorten Time]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend/Shorten Time]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order]
  • April 07, 2025: [Motion Extend/Shorten Time]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice 4m Dismissal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.