U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-01490
  • Case Name: Tidwell v. United States
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 18, 2025: [Withdrawal of Motion]
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice Other]
  • April 07, 2025: [Minute Order]
  • April 04, 2025: [Motion Compel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.