U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-02085
  • Case Name: Castaneda-Ambriz v. Hussein et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: [Order]
  • May 14, 2025: [Order on Stipulation]
  • May 14, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Case]
  • May 13, 2025: [Stipulation]
  • May 06, 2025: [Notice Other]
April, 2025
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 09, 2025: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice Docket Correction]
  • April 07, 2025: [Motion Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice Other]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.